Tsai, Chun-Hui (CPSO#: 67462)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:China Medical College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995