Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Tsai, Ellen (CPSO#: 63694)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Nov 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 1992

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone: (613) 725-2000
Fax: (613) 725-1300
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  September 7, 2010
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On September 7, 2010, Kingston General Hospital notified the College that Dr. Ellen Tsai's privileges were temporarily suspended, effective September 1, 2010.

On September 13, 2010, Hotel Dieu Hospital Kingston notified the College that Dr. Ellen Tsai's privileges were temporarily suspended, effective September 7, 2010.

On April 18, 2012, Kingston General Hospital notified the College that Dr. Ellen Tsai's privileges were reinstated in August 2011.

On December 13, 2013, Hotel Dieu Hospital Kingston notified the College that Dr. Ellen Tsai's privileges were reinstated September 13, 2011.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 26 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELLEN TSAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1992