Tsai, Ellie Linda (CPSO#: 71086)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Mar 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Mar 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
800 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E4
Phone: (613) 546-6673
Fax: (613) 544-3288
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 21 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELLIE LINDA TSAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2001 to 31 Jul 2001
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2001 to 30 Nov 2001
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2002