Tsai, Eve Chung (CPSO#: 69259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Neurosciences Unit C2
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-5383 Ext. 3
Fax: (613) 761-4967
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVE CHUNG TSAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2006