Tsai, Gina Yu-Ching (CPSO#: 90458)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Josephs Hospital 268 Grosvenor Street London, ON N6A 4V2
Date Received: 31 Jul 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2014