Tsai, Shian-Yih (CPSO#: 22013)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Japanese

Education:National Taiwan University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Wilson Medical Centre 130 Wilson Street Hamilton ON L8R 1E2 Tel: (905) 526-6250 Toll Free: 1 866-525-5434 Fax: (905) 526-9745
Date Received: 02 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 20 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016