Tsai, Willis Harvey (CPSO#: 63893)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 24 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Apr 2005