Tsakalaki, Anna (CPSO#: 66106)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:Laval University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
77 Vanier
Gatineau QC  J9H 1X4
Phone: (819) 684-7171

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA TSAKALAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSAKALAKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2017