Tsampalieros, Anne Kathryn (CPSO#: 84969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern ON
Division of Nephrology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2441
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Schieda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tsampalieros ( CPSO# 84969 )
Dr. N. Schieda ( CPSO# 84545 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1053 Carline Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 30 Nov 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE KATHRYN TSAMPALIEROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSAMPALIEROS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 28 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2007 to 17 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 8 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2012