Tsang, Albert Hin-Yeung (CPSO#: 69420)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 201
14 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1K2
Phone: (416) 928-2220
Fax: (416) 928-2219
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tsang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tsang ( CPSO# 69420 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
14 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1K2
Phone Number: (416) 928-2220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALBERT HIN-YEUNG TSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1997