Tsang, Bernice (CPSO#: 73729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pace Cardiology
581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Canada
Phone: 905-905-7917
Fax: (905) 953-0046
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Tsang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Tsang ( CPSO# 73729 )

Business Address:
Southlake Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
581 Davis Drive
Suite 602
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 953-7917

Business Address:
Suite 21
117 Young Street
Alliston ON  L9R 1V2
Phone Number: (705) 434-5338

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERNICE TSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2003