Tsang, Hoi Chau (CPSO#: 25488)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 28 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Dec 1997

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National Defense Medical Center, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Apr 1997
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 28 Dec 1997

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Nov 1997
Summary:

 In November 1997, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Tsang guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records that 
 are required to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 29(3); in that he failed to 
 maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 29(22); in that he made 
 improper use of the authority to prescribe, sell or dispense a drug, including falsifying a record 
 in respect of a prescription or the sale of a drug, contrary to s. 29(27); and in that he engaged 
 in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional, contrary to s. 29(33).    The Committee imposed the following penalty:

1)	Dr. 
 Tsang was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the Reprimand to be recorded on the 
 Register.

2)	Dr. Tsang(s certificate of registration be revoked.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 09, 1996


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Mar 1992
Summary:

 In March 1992, Dr. Tsang pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 60(3)(b) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that his rights or privileges under 
 the Narcotic Control Act (Canada) or the Food and Drugs Act (Canada) or the regulations under 
 either of them had been restricted or withdrawn.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and 
 found Dr. Tsang guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. 
 Tsang's licence to practice be suspended for a period of one month.  The Committee also ruled that 
 Dr. Tsang be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that 
 he must cooperate with an inspection of his practice of the kind provided for under s. 64 of the 
 Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 27 Mar 1992


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Jul 1981
Summary:

 In July 1981, Dr. Tsang pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1974, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an 
 offence relevant to his suitability to practice.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and 
 found Dr. Tsang guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. 
 Tsang's licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 27 Jan 1982
Hearing Date(s): 17 Jul 1981