Tsang, Jennifer Lai-Yee (CPSO#: 79089)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General Hospital
Critical Care Department
Room 2B
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 684-7271 Ext. 42919
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Tsang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tsang ( CPSO# 79089 )

Business Address:
Intensive Care Unit
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2R 6P9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LAI-YEE TSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007