Tsang, Joyce Sung Szu (CPSO#: 71010)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 Mar 1997 to 30 Mar 1997
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 31 Mar 1997 to 22 Apr 1997
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Apr 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000