Tsang, Michael Shiu Ming (CPSO#: 71346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Dec 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
280 West Beaver Creek Road
Unit 33
Jubilee Square
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Z1
Phone: (905) 762-1111
Fax: (905) 762-1112
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Tsang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tsang ( CPSO# 71346 )

Business Address:
33 - 280 West Beaver Creek Road
Jubilee Square
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Z1
Phone Number: (905) 762-1111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL SHIU MING TSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1999