Tsang, Raymond Wing Ming (CPSO#: 75621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
701 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone: (416) 913-6130
Fax: (647) 435-6730
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raymond W.M. Tsang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tsang ( CPSO# 75621 )

Business Address:
201 - 701 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone Number: (416) 913-6130

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND WING MING TSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Aug 2000 to 13 Sep 2000
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2001 to 22 Apr 2001
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Sep 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Apr 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2001