Tsao, Jonathan Robin (CPSO#: 55448)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
Peel Regional Cancer Program
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 4803
Fax: (905) 813-3962
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oakville-Trafalgar
Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Tsao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tsao ( CPSO# 55448 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN ROBIN TSAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSAO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1988