Tsao, May Na-Yuan (CPSO#: 66509)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4806
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: May Na-Yuan Tsao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tsao ( CPSO# 66509 )

Business Address:
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4806

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAY NA-YUAN TSAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSAO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1999