Tschirhart, Jeffrey Dennis (CPSO#: 62161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit D
65 Donly Drive North
Simcoe ON  N3Y 0C2
Phone: (519) 426-0011
Fax: (519) 426-1671
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. D. Tschirhart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tschirhart ( CPSO# 62161 )

Business Address:
65 Donly Drive North
Suite D
Simcoe ON  N3Y 0C2
Phone Number: (519) 426-0011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY DENNIS TSCHIRHART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSCHIRHART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1991