Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Tse, Chingying (CPSO#: 32444)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rexall Pharmacy
Cloverdale Mall
250 The East Mall Unit 174B
Etobicoke ON  M9B 3Y8
Phone: (416) 622-9220
Fax: (416) 622-9414
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.Y. Tse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tse ( CPSO# 32444 )

Business Address:
174B - 250 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M9B 3Y8
Phone Number: (416) 622-9220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHINGYING TSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1981