Tse, Frances Wing Man (CPSO#: 72431)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Calgary, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76733
Fax: (905) 523-6048
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Tse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Tse ( CPSO# 72431 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Oct 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCES WING MAN TSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2003