Tse, Gary Man Kit (CPSO#: 65807)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prince of Wales Hospital
Department of Anatomical
and Cellular Pathology
Shatin Hong Kong
Hong Kong S A R
Phone: 852 350 52359
Fax: 852 263 74858

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 05 Jul 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY MAN KIT TSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 14 Jul 1993
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 14 Jul 1994
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 14 Jul 1995
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1996