Tse, Richard Edward (CPSO#: 104972)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2014 to 07 Nov 2014
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 27 Apr 2015 to 08 May 2015
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 14 Sep 2015 to 02 Oct 2015
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2015