Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Tse, Sandra Tsz-Kwan (CPSO#: 70047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Emergency Medicine
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3562
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Tse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tse ( CPSO# 70047 )

Business Address:
Division of Emergency Medicine
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA TSZ-KWAN TSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1997