Tse, Shirley Mai Lin (CPSO#: 69258)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Rheumatology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Room 8253, Burton Wing
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7707
Fax: (416) 813-4989
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tse-Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tse ( CPSO# 69258 )
Dr. C. Chan ( CPSO# 69079 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
8N-842
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3073

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIRLEY MAI LIN TSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Other - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1999