Tsialogiannis, Evangelos (CPSO#: 107786)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 20 Oct 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2016