Tsien, Cynthia (CPSO#: 90027)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road - Box 255
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-8899 Ext. 77182
Fax: 6137396868
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA TSIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSIEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2008 to 12 Dec 2008
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 Oct 2010
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2012