Tsimiklis, Georgios (CPSO#: 81152)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:McGill University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Merivale Cardiovascular Consultants
Suite 201
1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Phone: (613) 722-8086
Fax: (613) 761-1944
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tsimiklis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Tsimiklis ( CPSO# 81152 )

Business Address:
Merivale Cardiovascular Consultants
1370 Clyde Avenue
Suite 201
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Phone Number: (613) 722-8086

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGIOS TSIMIKLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSIMIKLIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008