Tsin, Thomas Tai-Yan (CPSO#: 23770)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1971

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Phone: (905) 856-7061
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Tsin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tsin ( CPSO# 23770 )

Business Address:
8077 Islington Avenue
Suite 110
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Phone Number: (905) 856-7061

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS TAI-YAN TSIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1971

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On December 23, 2016, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice, London, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Thomas Tai Yan Tsin in respect of an incident that took place in July 2009.