Tso, John Wai Lun (CPSO#: 65051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1870 Lundy Ave
San Jose CA  95131
United States
Phone: (408) 573-9686
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John W. L. Tso Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 11 2009

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Written requests for records may be sent to Dr. Tso at tso.john@yahoo.ca
Date Received: 28 Jan 2010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN WAI LUN TSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993