Tsoulis, Christopher James (CPSO#: 54464)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tsoulis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 107 89 Dawson Road Guelph ON N1H 1B1
Date Received: 14 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 16 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016