Tsui, Elaine Yee Ling (CPSO#: 61902)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Feb 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Yee Hong Medical Centre
Mainfloor
60 Scottfield Drive
Scarborough ON  M1S 5T7
Phone: (416) 940-4818
Fax: (416) 321-5705
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph C.Y. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tsui ( CPSO# 61902 )
Dr. J. Chan ( CPSO# 33554 )

Business Address:
Unit 8
360 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Y7
Phone Number: (905) 881-0900

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE YEE LING TSUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1994