Tsui, Helen In Ling (CPSO#: 55906)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: Tsui, In Ling (used until: 04 Aug 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4261 Highway 7 East
Unit A6
Unionville ON  L3R 9W6
Phone: (905) 477-2211
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Helen In Ling Tsui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Tsui ( CPSO# 55906 )

Business Address:
Unit A6
4261 Highway 7 East
Unionville ON  L3R 9W6

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELEN IN LING TSUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1987