Tsui, Hubert Brian Young (CPSO#: 95671)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
11th Floor
Department of Pathology
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 5111
Fax: 416-340-5543
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hubert Brian Young Tsui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Tsui ( CPSO# 95671 )

Business Address:
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
11th Floor
200 Elizabeth Street
Suite 11-454A Eaton
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUBERT BRIAN YOUNG TSUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSUI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015