Tsui, Vincent Tien-Hun (CPSO#: 84586)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6532
Fax: (416) 530-6585
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vincent Tsui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tsui ( CPSO# 84586 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENT TIEN-HUN TSUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2011