Tsvetkova, Elena Valentinovna (CPSO#: 87211)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Latvian, Russian

Education:Riga Stradins University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
5th Floor
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4380
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elena Tsvetkova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tsvetkova ( CPSO# 87211 )

Business Address:
Grand River Regional Cancer Center
5th Floor
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELENA VALENTINOVNA TSVETKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSVETKOVA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012