Ttendo, Stephen Senyonjo (CPSO#: 77326)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Makerere Univ, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 27 Mar 2006 to 31 May 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2006