Tu, Jun-Bi (CPSO#: 41920)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:National Taiwan University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006