Tu, Karen (CPSO#: 65336)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
2nd Floor West Wing Suite 2W404
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5888 Ext. 1
Fax: (416) 603-5821
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Tu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tu ( CPSO# 65336 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing, 2nd Floor
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN TU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993