Tu, Le Mai (CPSO#: 69679)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 11 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Nov 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2010