Tubin, Stanislaw (CPSO#: 60747)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone: 7055229101
Fax: 7055225744
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stanislaw Tubin Medicine Professional Corporat

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tubin ( CPSO# 60747 )

Business Address:
2 - 2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone Number: (705) 522-9101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STANISLAW TUBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUBIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1990