Tubman, Michelle Lynn (CPSO#: 95119)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 10 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 10 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Sep 2016