Tuck, Alan Bradley (CPSO#: 55577)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus-Dept Pathology
P O Box 5339 Station B
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 36361
Fax: (519) 663-2930
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN BRADLEY TUCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 04 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1986