Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Tucker, Nancy Audrey (CPSO#: 58157)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1 001
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6757
Fax: (416) 586-5915
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nancy Tucker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Tucker ( CPSO# 58157 )

Business Address:
60 Murray Street
Suite 1 - 001
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
208 - 6 Maginn Mews
Toronto ON  M3C 0G9
Phone Number: (416) 449-3937

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY AUDREY TUCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUCKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006