Tucker, Tara Lorraine (CPSO#: 62735)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 316
1500 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 7Z2
Phone: (613) 422-6641
Fax: (613) 730-8881
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tucker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tucker ( CPSO# 62735 )

Business Address:
1500 Bank Street
Suite 316
Ottawa ON  K1H 7Z2
Phone Number: (613) 422-6641

Business Address:
A-114 Cameron Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 0X1

Business Address:
1400 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7L8

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARA LORRAINE TUCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUCKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 02 May 2006
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991