Tucker, William Stewart (CPSO#: 27286)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St. Michael's Hospital 30 Bond Street Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Date Received: 21 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 17 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016