Tudhope, Rebecca (CPSO#: 93561)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: Haque, Rebecca (used until: 21 Mar 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Middlesex Hospital Alliance
Strathroy Middlesex General Hosp.
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone: (519) 245-4747
Fax: 519-245-4787
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebecca Tudhope Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tudhope ( CPSO# 93561 )

Business Address:
Middlesex Hospital Alliance
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 246-9985

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA TUDHOPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUDHOPE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2015