Tudiver, Fraser Gerald (CPSO#: 27117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3337 Bondwood circle
Johnson City TN  37604
United States
Phone: (423) 341-2618

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Tennessee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRASER GERALD TUDIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUDIVER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2001