Tugg, Lorne Andrew (CPSO#: 60720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie Street
8 North
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6655
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lorne Tugg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tugg ( CPSO# 60720 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6655

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORNE ANDREW TUGG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUGG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990