Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Tuli, Raman (CPSO#: 62667)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2211 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7E9
Phone: (613) 226-5455
Fax: (613) 226-9478
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raman Tuli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 4 2006


Corporation Name: Raman Tuli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tuli ( CPSO# 62667 )

Business Address:
2211 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7E9
Phone Number: (613) 226-5455

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 27 Oct 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMAN TULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TULI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1991